Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Avaugour

Deceased

Bishop of Dol, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1320AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
27 Apr 1328AppointedBishop of Dol, France
8 May 1340DiedBishop of Dol, France

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Avaugour
Bishop Jean d’Avaugour (died ) Bishop of Dol

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 225, and Page 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast