Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fernando Cardinal de Austria

Deceased

Administrator of Toledo

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1609BornEl Escorial, Spain
29 Jul 161910.2Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jul 161910.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
1 Mar 162010.7AppointedAdministrator of Toledo, Spain
9 Nov 164132.4DiedAdministrator of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Austria:
Fernando Cardinal de Austria (born , died ) Administrator of Toledo

  • a cardinal for 22.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Jul 1619
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 250, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015