Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giorgio Attacchi

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Oct 1450AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
18 Feb 1451AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Trevico, Italy
25 Oct 1451AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
1454¹DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Attacchi
Archbishop Giorgio Attacchi (died 1454) Archbishop of Oristano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 92, and Page 267
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450, Number 42*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Aug 2018

Quantcast