Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father António da Assunção, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of São Tomé of Meliapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1742BornPorto, Portugal
2 Mar 176118.8ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
8 Aug 178240.2SelectedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
16 Dec 178240.6ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
1783¹40.6DiedBishop-Elect of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António da Assunção:
Father António da Assunção O.E.S.A. (born , died 1783) Bishop-Elect of São Tomé of Meliapore

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016