Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Arsengo, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bacău, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹Born
17 Feb 160757.1AppointedBishop of Bacău, Romania
9 Dec 160757.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bacău, Romania
18 Apr 161060.2DiedBishop of Bacău, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Arsengo
Bishop Gerolamo Arsengo O.F.M. Conv. (born 1550, died ) Bishop of Bacău

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios

  • a bishop for 2.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 107
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast