Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Arresdorf, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Acre (or Ptolomais)

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545²Born
23 Nov 159247.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
23 Nov 159247.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
23 Nov 159247.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
27 Nov 159247.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Acre (or Ptolomais)
1593²48.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acre (or Ptolomais)
28 Mar 162075.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Arresdorf (VIAF: 304932359)
Bishop Nikolaus Arresdorf O.F.M. Conv. (born 1545, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimpach, Luxembourg

  • a bishop for 27.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 67
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 1*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Jun 2018

Quantcast