Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Arnedo

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1561AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
17 Oct 1572AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
30 Sep 1574DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Arnedo
Bishop Diego Arnedo (died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuesca, Diocese of Huesca

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 71, Number 418
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 233, and Page 264
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,561, Number 34*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast