Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Cellach di Armagh

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1080¹Born
23 Sep 110525.7Ordained PriestPriest
1106¹26.0AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
23 Sep 110626.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
1 Apr 112949.2DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Cellach di Armagh (VIAF: 175537856)
Archbishop St. Cellach di Armagh (born 1080, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 20 May 2019

Quantcast