Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Abraham Petros I Ardzivian

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1679BornAintab
1706²26.7Ordained PriestPriest
1710²30.7Ordained BishopBishop
1739²59.7Converted
26 Nov 174061.6SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
26 Nov 174263.6ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
1 Oct 174970.4DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Abraham Petros I Ardzivian:
Patriarch Abraham Petros I Ardzivian (born , died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 165
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,924
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 33
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 3 Jul 2015