Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Archilegi

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Sep 1537AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
4 Feb 1541AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
2 May 1543DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Archilegi:
Bishop Angelo Archilegi (died ) Bishop of Assisi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013