Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Aragón y Navarra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1458¹Born
24 Oct 148224.8AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
1 Oct 148426.7AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
1519¹61.0ResignedBishop of Huesca, Spain
23 Dec 152668.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Huesca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Aragón y Navarra
Bishop Juan de Aragón y Navarra (born 1458, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huesca

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 210, and Page 207
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1482, Number 47*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Dec 2018

Quantcast