Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcellino Aramburu y Arandía, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vijayapuram, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1912Born
19 Dec 193523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
13 May 194835.6AppointedBishop of Vijayapuram, India
194936.2DiedBishop of Vijayapuram, India

MicroData Summary for Marcellino Aramburu y Arandía
Bishop Marcellino Aramburu y Arandía O.C.D. (born , died 1949) Bishop of Vijayapuram

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlzo

  • a priest for 13.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,949

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast