Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donato Ansani

Deceased

Bishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1658³Born
19 Sep 168224.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 171052.0AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
9 Jul 173274.2DiedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Donato Ansani
Bishop Donato Ansani (born , died ) Bishop of Marsico Nuovo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAriano

  • a priest for 49.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1731
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 258
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast