Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Berenguer Cardinal de Anglesola

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pseudocardinal of Benedict XIII)


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jan 1383AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
14 Dec 1384AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
5 Aug 1385Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
21 Dec 1397Elevated to Cardinal
21 Dec 1397AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
29 May 1406AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
23 Aug 1408DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Berenguer de Anglesola:
Berenguer Cardinal de Anglesola (died ) Bishop of Gerona

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
  • a cardinal for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Dec 1397
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,984
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 305, Number 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 24 Jan 2014