Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Andrade Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹BornSan Antonio
19 Mar 164443.2SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
28 Nov 164443.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
30 Nov 164443.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
6 Jul 164847.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Jaén, Spain
21 Feb 166463.1DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Andrade Castro:
Archbishop Fernando Andrade Castro (died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a bishop for 19.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,898
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 272, and Page 194
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 174, Number 1,078

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014