Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Pedro Amariz (Clasquerin)

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1348AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
29 Mar 1349Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
30 Oct 1357AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
27 Aug 1375AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
10 Jan 1380DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Amariz (Clasquerin):
Patriarch Pedro Amariz (Clasquerin) (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 378, and Page 479
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 93
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 303, Number 156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014