Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arnaud Amalric, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Mar 1212AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
6 May 1212Ordained BishopArchbishop of Narbonne, France
29 Sep 1225DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

MicroData Summary for Arnaud Amalric:
Archbishop Arnaud Amalric O. Cist. (died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

  • a bishop for 13.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 356
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,062

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014