Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gil Cardinal Álvarez de Albornoz, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1300¹BornCuenca
13 May 133838.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
17 Dec 135051.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
17 Dec 135051.0Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1356³56.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
23 Aug 1367³67.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gil Álvarez de Albornoz:
Gil Cardinal Álvarez de Albornoz C.R.S.A. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 16.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1350
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014