Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Álvarez de Faria y Sánchez Zarzosa

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1721Born
18 Dec 179776.9AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
6 Mar 179877.1Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
11 Apr 180281.2DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Álvarez de Faria y Sánchez Zarzosa
Bishop Gabriel Álvarez de Faria y Sánchez Zarzosa (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBadajoz

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,969
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,254
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 116, Number 610
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast