Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bálint Cardinal Alsáni

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1330¹Born
21 Jul 137444.5AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
25 Oct 137444.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
17 Dec 138454.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 138454.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
19 Nov 140878.8DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bálint Alsáni (VIAF: 75871326)
Bálint Cardinal Alsáni (born 1330, died ) Bishop of Pécs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlsán

  • a bishop for 34.0 years
  • a cardinal for 23.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast