Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius van Alphen

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1748BornBoxtel
27 Sep 178234.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
13 Aug 179042.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
1 May 183183.0DiedVicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Antonius van Alphen:
Bishop Antonius van Alphen (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013