Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóvão de Almeida Soares e Brito

Deceased

Bishop of Pinhel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1701³BornAlemtem
24 Mar 174342.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Feb 177271.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 177271.2SelectedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
8 Mar 177372.0ConfirmedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
11 Feb 178281.0DiedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóvão de Almeida Soares e Brito:
Bishop Cristóvão de Almeida Soares e Brito (born , died ) Bishop of Pinhel

  • a priest for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1779
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 338
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015