Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Alamanni

Deceased

Bishop of Mâcon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Apr 1556AppointedBishop of Bazas, France
29 May 1560AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
13 Aug 1582DiedBishop of Mâcon, France

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Alamanni
Bishop Giovanni Battista Alamanni (died ) Bishop of Mâcon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327, and Page 238
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018