Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gil Alamán y García Castrillo

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Sonora, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1825Born
21 Dec 185025.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 186842.8AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
8 Jan 186943.3ResignedBishop-Elect of Sonora, México
2 May 188256.6DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Gil Alamán y García Castrillo
Father Gil Alamán y García Castrillo (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Sonora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico

  • a priest for 31.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 524
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast