Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Aiello

Deceased

Bishop of Montepeloso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650¹Born
21 Mar 167727.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 167727.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 170656.1AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
Jan 1714³64.0DiedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Aiello
Bishop Antonio Aiello (born 1650, died Jan 1714) Bishop of Montepeloso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeroleto

  • a priest for 36.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 275
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast