Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinando de Aguiar y Saavedra

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹BornMadrid, Spain
20 Dec 165926.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 168350.6SelectedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
24 Apr 168451.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
Dec 1689³56.9DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando de Aguiar y Saavedra:
Archbishop Ferdinando de Aguiar y Saavedra (born 1633, died Dec 1689) Archbishop of Otranto

  • a priest for 29.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 223
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 225, Number 1,399
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015