Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Agucchi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1555BornBologna, Italy
9 Jun 160449.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 160449.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
27 Apr 160550.2DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Agucchi:
Girolamo Cardinal Agucchi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

  • a cardinal for .8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015