Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Pedro Josť (Giuseppe Pietro) Agostini, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Claraval, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1904BornBassiano, Italy
1929²24.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
12 Jul 196965.2ConfirmedAbbot of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil
30 Nov 196965.6InstalledAbbot of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1972²67.7ResignedAbbot of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 Jan 197368.7DiedAbbot Emeritus of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Josť (Giuseppe Pietro) Agostini
Abbot Pedro Josť (Giuseppe Pietro) Agostini O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Claraval

  • a priest for 44.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 5 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Aug 2016