Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Agatich, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornFiume
17 Jul 161747.5AppointedBishop of Senj, Croatia
21 Dec 161747.9Ordained BishopBishop of Senj, Croatia
30 Oct 164070.8DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Agatich:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Agatich O.S.A. (born 1570, died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a bishop for 22.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 309
  • bd/ob/d: CB, 17 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015