Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrien Aernoult, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai

Titular Bishop of Rhosus


Events

DateEventTitle
1483²ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
1490²Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
18 Sep 1517AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
18 Sep 1517AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
22 Nov 1517Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
Nov 1536³DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adrien Aernoult:
Bishop Adrien Aernoult O. Carm. (died Nov 1536) Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015