Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Ælfheah , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
953²BornWeston, Somerset
984²31.0AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
19 Oct 98431.7Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
1006²53.0AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
19 Apr 101259.2DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
1078²Canonized

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Ælfheah (VIAF: 21855515)
Archbishop St. Ælfheah O.S.B. (born 953, died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 15 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 16 Mar 2016