Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis de Acuña y Osorio

Deceased

Bishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Apr 1449AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
12 Nov 1456AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
14 Sep 1495DiedBishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis de Acuña y Osorio
Bishop Luis de Acuña y Osorio (died ) Bishop of Burgos

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 112, and Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast