Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pasquale Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1718BornNaples, Italy
12 Dec 177052.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Mar 177354.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 Apr 177556.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
13 Dec 177961.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
27 Sep 178061.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
29 Feb 178869.3DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Acquaviva d’Aragona:
Pasquale Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

  • a cardinal for 17.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015