Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccolò Cardinal d’Acciapaccio

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1382²Born
17 Sep 141028.7AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
11 Dec 141028.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tropea, Italy
18 Feb 143553.1AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
18 Dec 143957.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144058.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
3 Apr 144765.2DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccolò d’Acciapaccio (VIAF: 304917962)
Niccolò Cardinal d’Acciapaccio (born 1382, died ) Archbishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorrento

  • a bishop for 36.3 years
  • a cardinal for 7.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018