Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Fabian Abrantowicz, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Harbin [Harbin] (Russian), China

Priest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1884Born
9 Nov 190824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
31 May 192843.7AppointedApostolic Exarch of Harbin [Harbin] (Russian), China
193954.2ResignedApostolic Exarch of Harbin [Harbin] (Russian), China
2 Jan 194661.3DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Harbin [Harbin] (Russian), China

MicroData Summary for Fabian Abrantowicz (VIAF: 311212290)
Father Fabian Abrantowicz M.I.C. (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Harbin [Harbin]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNowogrudok
Death PlacePrison, Butyrka

  • a priest for 37.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast