Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théodore Abou-Karim

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

Titular Bishop of Alia


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jun 1832AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
22 Jun 1832AppointedTitular Bishop of Alia
24 Jul 1836Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alia
28 Sep 1855DiedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Théodore Abou-Karim
Bishop Théodore Abou-Karim (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGirgeh

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,788
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 210
  • c2: CB, 3 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,723
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast