Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís da Cunha de Abreu e Melo

Deceased

Bishop of Beja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1758BornTaveiro
11 Aug 178224.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 182062.2AppointedBishop of Beja, Portugal
9 Aug 183375.2DiedBishop of Beja, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Luís da Cunha de Abreu e Melo:
Bishop Luís da Cunha de Abreu e Melo (born , died ) Bishop of Beja

  • a priest for 51.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1833
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013