Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Altamiro Rossato, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1925Born
2 Feb 194721.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Dec 195126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Dec 198560.4AppointedBishop of Marabá, Para, Brazil
2 Mar 198660.6Ordained BishopBishop of Marabá, Para, Brazil
15 Mar 198963.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
17 Jul 199166.0SucceededArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Feb 200175.6RetiredArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 May 201488.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Altamiro Rossato
Archbishop Altamiro Rossato C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Alegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuparendi
Ordained BishopMarabá, Diocese of Marabá, Para

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 May 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 100, Number 8,655

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Dec 2020

Quantcast