Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri Le Cornu

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jun 1253AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
14 May 1254AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
21 Oct 1257DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Le Cornu
Archbishop Henri Le Cornu (died ) Archbishop of Sens

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 368, and Page 447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Feb 2021

Quantcast