Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacopo del Campolo

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras, France


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Feb 1419AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
7 Jul 1424AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
1 Dec 1425DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

MicroData Summary for Jacopo del Campolo
Bishop Jacopo del Campolo (died ) Bishop of Carpentras

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 168, and Page 461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Mar 2021

Quantcast