Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania

United

To: Vicariate Apostolic of Rabaul



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
8 December 1890ErectedVicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania (erected)
27 July 1897Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania Prefecture Apostolic of English Solomon Islands (erected)
23 May 1898Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania Prefecture Apostolic of German Solomon Islands (erected)
14 November 1922UnitedVicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania
Vicariate Apostolic of New Britain
Vicariate Apostolic of Rabaul

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014