Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian Werner

Bishop Emeritus of Austria, Military

Titular Bishop of Wiener Neustadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1943 Born
29 Jun 197733.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
9 Jan 199248.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Austria, Military
9 Jan 199248.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aeca
2 Feb 199248.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aeca
22 Feb 199450.1SucceededBishop of Austria, Military
11 Oct 199753.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Wiener Neustadt
16 Apr 201571.3ResignedBishop of Austria, Military

MicroData Summary for Christian Werner
Bishop Christian Werner (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Austria, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGogolin Slaski

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Austria, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,614
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018