Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvise Marcello, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹Born
17 Sep 163540.7AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
15 Dec 165359.0AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
16 Jul 166166.5DiedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alvise Marcello:
Bishop Alvise Marcello C.R.S. (died ) Bishop of Pula (Pola)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 283, and Page 314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013