Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Katzianer

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1537AppointedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
31 Mar 1538Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
31 Mar 1543DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Franz Katzianer (VIAF: 86021180)
Bishop Franz Katzianer (died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopOberburg

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 217
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast