Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rostaing d’Ancezune

Deceased

Archbishop of Embrun, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Sep 1487AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
26 Nov 1494AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
27 Jul 1510DiedArchbishop of Embrun, France

MicroData Summary for Rostaing d’Ancezune
Archbishop Rostaing d’Ancezune (died ) Archbishop of Embrun

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 155, and Page 148
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1487, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Dec 2018

Quantcast